OK SB1887 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Dissolution of marriage; modifying certain military retainer pay division determinations. Effective date.
Title
Dissolution of marriage; modifying certain military retainer pay division determinations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-23 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-23 | To Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-23 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2012-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-21 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2012-05-18 | 2 CCR read | |
2012-05-17 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2012-05-16 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2012-05-14 | Title restored | |
2012-05-14 | CCR read | |
2012-05-08 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-05-03 | SCs named Russell, Sykes, Simpson, Treat, Ivester, Laster | |
2012-05-03 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2012-04-30 | HAs read | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-26 | Amended | |
2012-04-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett | |
2012-04-26 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin, Stiles, Brumbaugh, Roberts (Dustin), Rousselot | |
2012-04-10 | Remove Representative Virgin as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jordan | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | coauthored by Ivester, Garrison, Coates, Anderson, Treat, Ellis, Laster, Eason McIntyre | |
2012-03-12 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Simpson | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Virgin (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Russell | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |