OK SB1888 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; apportionment; providing for certain remittance; directing deposit for certain maintenance and operations; disbursement; electronic forms; digital inspection process Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Transportation; apportionment; providing for certain remittance; directing deposit for certain maintenance and operations; disbursement; electronic forms; digital inspection process Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Transportation: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2020-05-15 | Senate | coauthored by Boles |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2020-05-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-15 | House | Emergency added |
2020-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2020-05-15 | House | Amended |
2020-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2020-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Taylor, Sims, Russ, Johns |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |