OK SB1889 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; modifying contribution rates for certain elected officials. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Public Employees Retirement System; modifying contribution rates for certain elected officials. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-20 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-17 | Title restored | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read | |
2010-05-13 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Miller, Martin (Steve), Morrissette | |
2010-04-27 | SCs named Stanislawski, Aldridge, Brown, Mazzei, Russell, Sparks | |
2010-04-26 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-04-05 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-05 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-16 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1102 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1102 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1103 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 913 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 914 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 915 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |