OK SB1896 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unmanned aerial systems; creating the Unmanned Aircraft Systems Development Act of 2020; allowing for certain agency to develop certain test and procedures for operating unmanned aerial systems. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Unmanned aerial systems; creating the Unmanned Aircraft Systems Development Act of 2020; allowing for certain agency to develop certain test and procedures for operating unmanned aerial systems. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |