OK SB1905 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Medical liability actions; prohibiting admissibility of certain action. Effective date.
Title
Medical liability actions; prohibiting admissibility of certain action. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 15 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-12 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Sykes, Crain, Holt, Johnson (Rob), Ivester, Shumate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 11 |
2014-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-09 | House | Title stricken |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 4 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |