OK SB1916 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author)
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency management; consolidating the Oklahoma Office of Homeland Security into the Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management. Effective date.
Title
Emergency management; consolidating the Oklahoma Office of Homeland Security into the Oklahoma Department of Emergency Management. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (David) (principal House author) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |