OK SB2 | 2013 | Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Dismissal; modifying procedures for dismissal of actions.
Title
Dismissal; modifying procedures for dismissal of actions.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Aaron Stiles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 09/10/2013 |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-09-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-09-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-09-09 | House | Motion expired |
2013-09-09 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Stiles |
2013-09-09 | House | Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 19 |
2013-09-09 | House | Ayes: 63 Nays: 18 |
2013-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2013-09-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 9 |
2013-09-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright, Ritze |
2013-09-09 | House | General Order |
2013-09-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2013-09-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2013-09-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-09-04 | Senate | coauthored by Stiles |
2013-09-04 | Senate | coauthored by Jolley, Shortey |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-09-03 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-09-03 | Senate | coauthored by Sykes |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-09-03 | Senate | First Reading |