OK SB210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB210
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Coauthored by Representative Sanders
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Coauthored by Representative Sanders
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election procedures; specifying certain type of procedure for executing absentee ballot affidavits for certain elections; emergency.
Title
Election procedures; specifying certain type of procedure for executing absentee ballot affidavits for certain elections; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendment (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate: House Amendment (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 15 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sanders |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted AYES: 38 NAYS: 9 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Matthews |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Floyd |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Hicks |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Thompson; authored by Senator Treat |
2020-05-06 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 26 |
2020-05-06 | House | Emergency added |
2020-05-06 | House | Ayes: 70 Nays: 17 |
2020-05-06 | House | Amended |
2020-05-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall, West (Kevin), CrosswhiteHader, Davis, Ford, Roberts (Dustin), Pfeiffer, McDugle, Patzkowsky, Moore, Boles, Sneed, Roberts (Sean), West (Josh), Cornwell |
2020-05-06 | House | General Order |
2020-05-06 | House | Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall |
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shaw |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee