OK SB213 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB213
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supreme Court; change in districts if Congressional Districts are modified. Effective date.
Title
Supreme Court; change in districts if Congressional Districts are modified. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Tim Downing [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Died in conference |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Dahm, Sykes, Holt, Daniels, Standridge, Floyd, Dossett |
2017-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 15 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | Title stricken |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Downing (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB213 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference