OK SB2150 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying certain domestic abuse offenses. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying certain domestic abuse offenses. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 | |
2010-05-21 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | |
2010-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Schwartz, Ritze | |
2010-04-13 | Remove Representative Schwartz as principal House author and substitute with Representative Peters | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Schwartz (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Schwartz | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sparks | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |