OK SB2163 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Damages; creating the Health Care Indemnity Trust Fund. Emergency.
Title
Damages; creating the Health Care Indemnity Trust Fund. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 38; Ayes: 80 Nays: 16 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read | |
2010-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Sullivan, Duncan, Jordan, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-04-27 | SCs named Paddack, Coffee, Lamb, Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-04-26 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 41; Ayes: 42 Nays: 26 | |
2010-04-20 | Amended | |
2010-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peterson | |
2010-04-20 | General Order | |
2010-04-06 | Emergency added | |
2010-04-06 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Paddack | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |