OK SB2166 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying circumstances constituting embezzlement. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying circumstances constituting embezzlement. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-05-10 | Conference granted, HC's named Nelson, Duncan, Jordan, Inman, Lamons | |
2010-05-06 | SCs named Branan, Anderson, Sykes, Crain, Laster, Paddack | |
2010-05-05 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-03-30 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-30 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-02 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-16 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Nelson | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Branan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |