OK SB227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB227
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Information Services Department Act; consolidating the Information Services Division of OMES with the Oklahoma Information Services Department.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Information Services Department Act; consolidating the Information Services Division of OMES with the Oklahoma Information Services Department.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Mize, Phillips, Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB227 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Enacting clause stricken