OK SB24 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; modifying language and definitions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; modifying language and definitions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-10SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-10HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-09SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-09HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9
2019-04-09HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
2019-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback