OK SB240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB240
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; requiring that certain preference be given to Oklahoma travel agencies. Effective date.
Title
State government; requiring that certain preference be given to Oklahoma travel agencies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2019 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-04 | House | General Order |
2019-03-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2019-03-27 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kiger |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB240 (Carry Over) 2019-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2019