OK SB34 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB34
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Self-Defense Act; clarifying language. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Self-Defense Act; clarifying language. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB34 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary