OK SB365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB365
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Oklahoma Driving Automation System Uniformity Act. Conditional effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Oklahoma Driving Automation System Uniformity Act. Conditional effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 12 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB365 (Carry Over) 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019