OK SB392 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Product labeling; prohibiting persons advertising or selling food plans or carcasses from engaging in certain misleading or deceptive practices. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Product labeling; prohibiting persons advertising or selling food plans or carcasses from engaging in certain misleading or deceptive practices. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateApproved by Governor 04/26/2019
2019-04-23SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1
2019-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Sanders
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback