OK SB454 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB454
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - coauthored by Bell
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - coauthored by Bell
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' treatment programs; directing development and implementation of certain programs. Effective date.
Title
Veterans' treatment programs; directing development and implementation of certain programs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | coauthored by Bell |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newhouse |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB454 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - coauthored by Bell
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb454&Session=2000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB454%20INT.PDF |