OK SB603 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB603
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Risk assessment for offenders; requiring certain assessment be given; development of case plan. Effective date.
Title
Risk assessment for offenders; requiring certain assessment be given; development of case plan. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2017-05-25 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative ODonnell |
2017-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26 |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland |
2017-04-20 | House | General Order |
2017-04-12 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-12 | House | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative O'Donnell (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB603 (Carry Over) 2017-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 530 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 530 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |