OK SB606 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB606
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; modifying entities who may become domestic insurers in certain circumstances.
Title
Insurance; modifying entities who may become domestic insurers in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Glen Mulready [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Jason Smalley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 62 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Motion expired |
2018-05-03 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Mulready |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0; Ayes: 62 Nays: 20 |
2018-05-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Smalley |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Emergency added |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-27 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-04-27 | Senate | coauthored by Moore |
2018-04-19 | Senate | SCs named Sparks, Brown, Paxton, Quinn, Rosino, Leewright, Matthews |
2018-04-12 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2018-04-12 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-05 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments