OK SB617 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB617
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Revenue Stabilization Fund; exception for certain limitations of deposit; requiring certain utilization of funds be in equal portions; prohibiting specific use of fund in certain fiscal year. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; Revenue Stabilization Fund; exception for certain limitations of deposit; requiring certain utilization of funds be in equal portions; prohibiting specific use of fund in certain fiscal year. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/09/2020 |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-04-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2020-04-06 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2020-04-06 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-04-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-04-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-04-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 |
2020-04-06 | House | Emergency added |
2020-04-06 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2020-04-06 | House | Title restored |
2020-04-06 | House | Amended |
2020-04-06 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-04-06 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB617 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken