OK SB629 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; relating to the Nursing Facilities Quality of Care Fee; Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs; complaints and investigations. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; relating to the Nursing Facilities Quality of Care Fee; Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs; complaints and investigations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 33 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 47 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 33 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Veterans & Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Ortega, McDaniel (Jeannie), McDaniel (Curtis), Perryman |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-20 | Senate | coauthored by Wesselhoft |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-04-29 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2013-04-29 | Senate | coauthored by Morrissette |
2013-04-22 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-09 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-08 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-08 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-08 | House | Amended |
2013-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Williams, Hoskin |
2013-04-08 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance), Standridge, Fields |
2013-03-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Pittman |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Lockhart |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Hardin (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Government
Health and Mental Health
Health Care
Medicare and Medicaid
Military and Veterans
Public Safety
Veterans and Militia
Health and Mental Health
Health Care
Medicare and Medicaid
Military and Veterans
Public Safety
Veterans and Militia
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1903 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1905 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1911 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1912 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1916 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1951 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 890 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 900 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |