OK SB698 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Quinn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Quinn
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; modifying provisions relating to design-build and at-risk construction management. Effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; modifying provisions relating to design-build and at-risk construction management. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Quinn |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dugger |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB698 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Remove as author Senator Dugger; authored by Senator Quinn