OK SB773 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB773
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health and substance abuse services; creating the Oklahoma Mental Health Loan Repayment Act. Effective date.
Title
Mental health and substance abuse services; creating the Oklahoma Mental Health Loan Repayment Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid over |
2019-04-16 | House | General Order |
2019-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wright (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB773 (Carry Over) 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2019