OK SB788 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Contractors; proof of identification numbers and workers' compensation policy. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Contractors; proof of identification numbers and workers' compensation policy. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2013-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 6 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 9 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Considered and deferred |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Emergency added |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-21 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative McDaniel (Randy) and substitute with Representative Osborn |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-02 | Senate | SCs named Newberry, Sykes, Ford, Coates, Garrison, Shumate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 33 |
2013-04-16 | House | General Order |
2013-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |