OK SB789 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; allowing wholesalers to sell certain quantities of alcoholic beverages at agreed upon prices in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; allowing wholesalers to sell certain quantities of alcoholic beverages at agreed upon prices in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 14 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 14 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 14 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 48 Nays: 10 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-02 | Senate | SCs named Johnson (Rob), Newberry, Marlatt, Brinkley, Ballenger, Bass |
2013-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 17 |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 163 | 19A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |