OK SB801 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB801
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses; modifying certain definition. Emergency.
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses; modifying certain definition. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/07/2020 |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fugate |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-04 | House | To Senate |
2020-05-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-04 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp |
2020-05-04 | House | General Order |
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Emergency added |
2020-02-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator Rosino |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cornwell |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB801 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs