OK SB814 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB814
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; making certain exception to number of drinks per person; providing for tasting flights. Effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; making certain exception to number of drinks per person; providing for tasting flights. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 24 |
2019-04-25 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Tourism Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB814 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019