OK SB820 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Courts and judges of the district courts; modifying certain electoral districts. Effective dates. Emergency.
Title
Courts and judges of the district courts; modifying certain electoral districts. Effective dates. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Motion expired |
2013-05-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Shelton |
2013-05-22 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 9 |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Stiles |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-22 | Senate | SCs named Marlatt, Griffin, Schulz, Bingman, Sparks, Burrage |
2013-04-22 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-17 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Amended |
2013-04-16 | House | General Order |
2013-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 92 | 15b | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 15c | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 15d | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 8b | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 8d | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 92 | 8e | Amended Code | See Bill Text |