OK SB85 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax credits; modifying time period and condition under which credits are allowed. Effective date.
Title
Income tax credits; modifying time period and condition under which credits are allowed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 20 |
2015-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-04 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Mazzei, Boggs, Jech, Smalley, Jolley, Paddack, Wyrick |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-09 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | General Order |
2015-04-01 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Sharp |
2015-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |