OK SB860 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB860
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
General appropriations; making appropriations to various agencies; providing for certain transfers of funds. Effective date.
Title
General appropriations; making appropriations to various agencies; providing for certain transfers of funds. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 67 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 32 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 32 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Ayes: 67 Nays: 25 |
2017-05-26 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2017-05-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 42 |
2017-05-26 | House | Ayes: 47 Nays: 22 |
2017-05-26 | House | Motion to rescind adoption of JCR tabled |
2017-05-26 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-26 | House | General Order |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-05-24 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Joint Rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB860 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017