OK SB876 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB876
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; authorizing Board to hire physician as Medical Advisor; licenses; application; registration; suspension of licensure. Effective date.
Title
State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision; authorizing Board to hire physician as Medical Advisor; licenses; application; registration; suspension of licensure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2003-12-31 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2003-12-31 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-14 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-07 | Senate | SCs named McCortney, Smalley, Daniels, Rosino, Ikley-Freeman, Hicks |
2019-05-02 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2019-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Non-Appropriated Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB876 (Carry Over) 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019