OK SB893 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credits for electricity generated by zero-emission facilities; imposing cap on tax credits; authorizing carryover of unused credits; requiring report from Tax Commission and Secretary of Energy and Environment. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credits for electricity generated by zero-emission facilities; imposing cap on tax credits; authorizing carryover of unused credits; requiring report from Tax Commission and Secretary of Energy and Environment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 8 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 26 |
2018-04-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2018-04-25 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-10 | House | Remove Representative Thomsen as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sears |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Bergstrom |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Thomsen (principal House author) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2357 | 32A | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |