OK SB923 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small Employer Quality Jobs Incentive Act; modifying requirements for incentive payments. Effective date.
Title
Small Employer Quality Jobs Incentive Act; modifying requirements for incentive payments. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 57 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 26 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 57 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Considered |
2018-04-24 | House | Laid over |
2018-04-24 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-24 | House | General Order |
2018-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |