OK SB954 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Vetoed 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Vetoed 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Taxes; modifying administration of, and procedures relating to, certain appraisal system; modifying documentary stamp tax levy. Effective date.
Title
Taxes; modifying administration of, and procedures relating to, certain appraisal system; modifying documentary stamp tax levy. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 5 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 57) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE PREVIOUS QUESTION (Y: 5 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 57) [FAIL]
2013-05-24 - House - House: ADOPT CCR (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Vetoed 06/06/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Veto message read |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 57 Nays: 3 |
2013-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-20 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2013-04-30 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-08 | House | Emergency added |
2013-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 16 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 16 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |