OK SB990 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicare; restricting rate changes to certain time. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare; restricting rate changes to certain time. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateApproved by Governor 04/23/2019
2019-04-17SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-17HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-16HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-04-16HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2019-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-28SenateCoauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Scott
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback