OR HB2061 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 388, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 388, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes structure for annual permit fees for confined animal feeding operations. Allows State Department of Agriculture to establish tiers within size categories for confined animal feeding operations for purposes of determining amount of mandatory annual permit fee assessment. Provides for department to establish annual permit fee for confined animal feeding operations and concentrated animal feeding operations. Requires department to establish permit application fees for new confined animal feeding operations or concentrated animal feeding operations or for transfer of permits for confined animal feeding operations or concentrated animal feeding operations. Becomes operative January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to fees for animal feeding operations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 388, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Hansell. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 22--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Williams, Wilson, Zika. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-11 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |