OR HB2089 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 188, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 188, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits title loan lender and payday loan lender from making loan to consumer until seven days after consumer has fully repaid outstanding title loan or payday loan. Becomes operative on January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to requiring consumers to repay certain outstanding consumer loans before lenders make new consumer loans; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 188, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 13--Barreto, Bonham, Findley, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Clem. |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |