OR HB2101 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 132, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 132, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes partnership and partner audit procedures for Department of Revenue in conformity with federal centralized partnership audit regime. Allows department to issue assessment and collect taxes at partnership level based on adjustments arising from federal partnership-level audit or administrative adjustment request. Applies to partnership adjustments for partnership tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Provides that election by pass-through entity to file composite return is irrevocable. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to audits of partnerships; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 132, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso. |
2019-03-28 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |