OR HB2109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that, in election proposing annexation, votes from city and territory to be annexed be counted separately to determine separate majorities if territory to be annexed includes 100 acres or more. Requires that votes from city and territory to be annexed be combined to determine single majority if territory to be annexed includes less than 100 acres.
Title
Relating to annexation.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Helm, Holvey, McLain, Meek, Power, Rayfield; Excused, 2--Barreto, Boshart Davis. |
2019-04-09 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |