OR HB2137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates income tax credit for operation costs of housing for agricultural workers. Provides for refundability of credit and for transferability of credit earned by tax-exempt entity. Imposes limitation on total credits allowed to all owners of housing per tax year. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Extends sunset for tax credits for owner or operator of agriculture workforce housing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for agriculture workforce housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |