OR HB2222 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 136, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 136, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Forestry Department to annually report to Legislative Assembly or interim committee regarding implementation and enforcement of property notifications and certifications required under Oregon Forestland-Urban Interface Fire Protection Act. Requires State Forestry Department to annually report to Legislative Assembly or interim committee regarding development, implementation and administration of] implementation and enforcement of property notifications and certifications required under Oregon Forestland-Urban Interface Fire Protection Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Forestland-Urban Interface Fire Protection Act; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Rep. Cheri Helt [R] |
Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Chapter 136, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 22, 2019. |
2019-05-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |