OR HB2239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases number of circuit court judges in certain judicial districts. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the establishment of circuit court judge positions; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |