OR HB2240 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 60, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 60, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Court Administrator to establish Central Violations Bureau and designate employees to act as violations clerks. Specifies authority of violations clerks. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a Central Violations Bureau; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 60, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Nathanson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2019-02-11 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-02-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |