OR HB2373 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows State Forester to order use of wildfire suppression personnel, equipment and services on federal lands within state borders. Allows State Forester to order use of wildfire suppression personnel, equipment and services on any] federal lands within state borders. Creates exceptions.
Title
Relating to wildfire suppression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-19 | House | Motion to withdraw from Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 37--Alonso Leon, Barker, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Absent, 1--McLane; Excused, 1--Hernandez. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |