OR HB2447 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 194, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 194, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Director of the Oregon Health Authority to provide forum for all vertically integrated, nonprofit health care systems in Oregon to collaborate to envision health care delivery system for Oregon's future. Requires supervision of collaboration by director or director's designee and exempts collaborative activities from federal antitrust law under state action doctrine.
Title
Relating to the future of health care delivery in Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 194, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-15 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Barreto, McLane. |
2019-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |