OR HB2530 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 405, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 405, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires persons who send or serve certain documents related to termination of tenancy, forcible entry or detainer and residential foreclosures to include certain information regarding assistance that may be available to veterans of armed forces. Requires persons who send or serve certain documents related to termination of tenancy, forcible entry or detainer , overdue loan payments for loans secured by residential real property] and residential foreclosures to include certain information regarding assistance that may be available to veterans of armed forces. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs and Housing and Community Services Department to jointly submit written report on veterans' housing programs to interim House committee related to veterans.
Title
Relating to housing for veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Sen. Denyc Boles [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 405, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde, Zika. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Prusak, Stark. |
2019-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 22, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |