OR HB2847 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 495, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 495, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands list of hospitals whose medical staff may qualify for specified income tax credit. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to income tax credits for rural health care practitioners; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 495, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, McLane. |
2019-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |