OR HB2932 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits court from inquiring into defendant's immigration status or requiring defendant to disclose defendant's immigration status at time of plea or at any other time during criminal proceeding. Requires court to allow defendant, upon request, additional time for plea decision after informing defendant about possible adverse immigration consequences of plea. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the immigration status of criminal defendants; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseGovernor signed.
2019-06-14SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-12SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Johnson.
2019-06-11SenateCarried over to 06-12 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-06SenateTaken from 06-06 Calendar and placed on 06-11 Calendar by unanimous consent.
2019-06-05SenateCarried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-04SenateCarried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
2019-06-03SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-05-13SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-04-17SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-16HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Barreto, Greenlick.
2019-04-15HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2019 Calendar.
2019-04-11HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2019-02-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback